Multiplication Shortcuts

Shortcut 1

Squaring of numbers ending with “5” 652= 65×65=4225

But how,

There are two steps

  • Put (5×5=25) in right side
  • Then put {(6×6)+6}=42 in the left side
  • Then we get 4225

Shortcut 2 

If we have AB as a number so that B must be 5, then follow the below formula for easy remembering, AB2 = (A2+A) × 100 +B2

Example:

252 = (22+2) ×100+52

= 6×100+25=600+25=625.

Shortcut 3 

Take two digit numbers say “AB” and “AC” so that, (B+C) =10, always Then, we should follow the below formula for easy remembering

AB×AC= {(A2+A) ×100} + (B×C)

Example:

42×48 = {(42+4) ×100} + (8×2) = 2016.

 

Shortcut 4

Let us take an example, 234×389=?

To find the answer very easily follow the below analysis,

For 200, (200×300=60000, 200×80=16000, 200×9=1800, then add all the results, we get 77800)

For 30, (30×300=9000, 30×80=2400, 30×9=270, then add all the results, we get 11670)

For 4, (4×300=1200, 4×80=320, 4×9=36, the adding all results we get 1556) Now adding all the results (in bold letter) we get in the previous steps,

77800+11670+1556=91026,

This process is easier than the conventional multiplication process and we get the same answer if we directly multiply 234 with 389.

X
- Enter Your Location -
- or -
Exambin | IBPS SSC UPSC Preparations
Exambin | IBPS SSC UPSC Preparations
Register New Account
Reset Password
Compare items
  • Total (0)
Compare
0
ARE YOU READY? GET IT NOW!
Increase more than 500% of Email Subscribers!
Your Information will never be shared with any third party.
ARE YOU READY? GET IT NOW!
Get Weekly Current Affairs Magazine to your inbox.
Your Information will never be shared with any third party.
CURRENT AFFAIRS THAT MATTERS TO YOU
Get Weekly Current Affairs Magazine to your inbox.
We never share your details.
CURRENT AFFAIRS THAT MATTERS TO YOU
Get Weekly Current Affairs Magazine to your inbox.
We never share your details.